WY HB0012 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-13 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to contagious and infectious diseases among livestock; revising provisions related to contagious and infectious diseases among livestock and other animals as specified; increasing certain penalties related to diseases among livestock and other animals as specified; repealing obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contagious and infectious diseases among livestock.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - S05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-11 - House - H05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-13 Assigned Chapter Number
2013-02-12 Governor Signed HEA0002
2013-02-08SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0002
2013-02-07HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0002
2013-02-07 Assigned Number HEA0002
2013-02-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-05SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-30SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2013-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-14HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-11HousePassed CoW
2013-01-11 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-11HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-11HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-11HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2012-11-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback