WY HB0290 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 183
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the code of civil procedure; modifying provisions relating to the sale and redemption of realty sold under mortgage foreclosure or execution; authorizing a certificate of sale as specified; creating a purchaser's right of entry as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property redemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 183
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0114
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0114
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0114
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0114
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-11SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback