WY HB0276 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Assigned Chapter Number 144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing that any shed antlers and horns on state or public land are the property of the state; requiring nonresidents to obtain a conservation stamp to collect shed antlers and horns on state or public land; providing exceptions specifying fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Shed antlers and horns conservation stamp.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Berger [R] | Rep. Jon Conrad [R] | Rep. Joshua Larson [R] | Rep. Tony Niemiec [R] |
Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Sen. Stacy Jones [R] | Sen. John Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - Concur:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-3-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-23-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-3-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-23-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Assigned Chapter Number 144 | |
2023-03-02 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0076 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0076 |
2023-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0076 |
2023-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0076 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Concur:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2023-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 16-12-3-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-17 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-08 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-23-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |