WY HB0270 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 198 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing for gray wolf damage compensation eligibility; specifying applicability; providing for rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gray wolf damage compensation eligiblity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14 Chapter No. 198 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-14 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-14 Governor Signed HEA No. 0117
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0117
2017-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0117
2017-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0117
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Passed 56-0-4-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-14SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2017-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2017-02-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-02HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-01HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2017-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback