WY HB0263 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to emergency funding of government; authorizing emergency government programs as specified; providing legislative findings; requiring reporting; providing for rulemaking; authorizing the expenditure of a portion of the state's remaining CARES Act and American Rescue Plan Act funds; providing appropriations; reappropriating funds; providing an appropriation to restore funding for the operation of state government as specified; specifying conditions on appropriations and expenditure of funds; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State coronavirus recovery funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |