WY HB0259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0097
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0097
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to boards and commissions; establishing the governor as chairman as specified; requiring recorded votes on final actions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State elected officials-board votes and chairmanship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0097 |
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0097 |
2013-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA0097 | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |