WY HB0254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the funding of government operations; providing funding for the replacement of a transportation computer system; creating an account; imposing an additional fee for driver's licenses, permits and for duplicates and renewals; specifying the distribution of fees; making conforming amendments; assigning duties to the department of transportation and department of enterprise technology services for replacement of the revenue information system; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Transportation computer system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Adopted HB0254JC001: 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Adopted HB0254JC001: 32-22-6-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Failed 3-54-3-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Adopted HB0254JC001: 32-22-6-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Failed 3-54-3-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 152 | |
2021-04-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0094 | |
2021-04-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0094 |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0094 |
2021-04-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0094 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-04-06 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2021-04-06 | House | Concur:Failed 3-54-3-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-4-1-0-0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-31 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-12-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |