WY HB0253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 148
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the University of Wyoming and community colleges; prohibiting the University of Wyoming and community colleges from expending funds on abortions or insurance coverage for abortions as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Higher education-ban on funding for abortions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Passed 47-10-3-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 148 | |
2021-04-12 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0089 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0089 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0089 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Concur:Passed 47-10-3-0-0 |
2021-04-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-26 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-18 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |