WY HB0246 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legal time; requiring the state to observe a time zone as specified; establishing a new uniform state time; repealing provisions; specifying a contingency; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mountain standard time-2.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Scott Heiner [R] | Rep. Ben Hornok [R] | Rep. Pepper Ottman [R] |
Rep. Reuben Tarver [R] | Rep. Tamara Trujillo [R] | Rep. John Winter [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2023/HB0246 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Introduced/HB0246.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Fiscal/HB0246.pdf |