WY HB0246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to children; amending the juvenile justice act to eliminate fines, fees and costs imposed on juveniles or their parents in juvenile delinquency and criminal court proceedings; requiring the appointment of an attorney as specified; removing the term child from contempt of court and contempt of court from the definition of delinquent act; eliminating civil actions for support as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Eliminate fines and fees for juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-08 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |