WY HB0231 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the public defender; removing a requirement for federal funding to be included in calculating the state public defender budget for purposes of determining state and county shares; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public defender funding amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-01 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |