WY HB0230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; authorizing compensation for persons exonerated based on DNA testing and found factually innocent; specifying conditions, requirements and limitations on authorized compensation; retaining governmental immunity as specified; conforming provisions; providing for stay of order of expungement as specified; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Compensation for exoneration based on DNA.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Sen. Floyd Esquibel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0230.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0230.pdf |