WY HB0228 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the regulation of traffic on highways; amending provisions governing the reporting of vehicle accidents; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reporting of vehicle accidents.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] |
Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Joe MacGuire [R] | Sen. Reynolds Kost [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Did not consider for COW |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-21 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-0-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |