WY HB0221 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Goggles, Petersen and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Madden, Miller and Semlek M Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Goggles, Petersen and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Madden, Miller and Semlek M Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; providing for the distribution of the tax upon production of electricity from wind resources; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electricity production tax-distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Cale Case [R] | Rep. Ruth Petroff [R] | Rep. Jim Roscoe [I] | Sen. John Schiffer [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Goggles, Petersen and Vranish Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Campbell, Childers, Madden, Miller and Semlek M Ayes 3 Nays 6 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-03-01 | (H) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 4-3(c) | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H03; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0221.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0221.pdf |