WY HB0220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to taxation; creating the National Retail Fairness Act; imposing an income tax on businesses as specified; providing for administration of the tax; providing penalties; authorizing rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Retail Fairness Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2019-02-26SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-29SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25House3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0
2019-01-24House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback