WY HB0219 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; requiring acceptable voter identification from voters when requesting and obtaining absentee ballots; making conforming amendments; repealing conflicting provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Voter identification-ballot requests.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Jennings [R] | Rep. Christopher Knapp [R] | Rep. Ken Pendergraft [R] | Rep. Rachel Rodriguez-Williams [R] |
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2023/HB0219 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Introduced/HB0219.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Fiscal/HB0219.pdf |