WY HB0218 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the collection of debts due the state or other governmental entities; providing a fee for collection costs when the state or governmental entity employs a collection agency to recover debts due the state; amending existing statutes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Collection costs for debts owed to the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2013-01-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0218.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0218.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0218.htm |