WY HB0216 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fire prevention and electrical safety; authorizing third parties to perform plan reviews of certain proposed projects; requiring the state fire marshal to approve third parties as specified; authorizing third parties to collect fees; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fire and electrical safety plan reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 43-14-3-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 43-14-3-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-26 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-02-18 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 43-14-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |