WY HB0212 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to statutory gender designations; amending archaic language; codifying rights of parties legally authorized to marry in Wyoming; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Statutory gender references.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | Rerefer to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |