WY HB0209 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 191 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; providing for a study and a report on wage and benefit disparities; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disparity in wages and benefits between men and women.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Chapter No. 191 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-10 Governor Signed HEA No. 0112
2017-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0112
2017-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0112
2017-03-02 Assigned Number HEA No. 0112
2017-03-02HouseConcur:Passed 41-19-0-0-0
2017-03-01HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-03-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2017-02-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-27SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-22SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2017-02-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 37-23-0-0-0
2017-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2017-01-27HousePlaced on General File
2017-01-27HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback