WY HB0209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Hathaway student scholarship program; establishing a reporting system for honor Hathaway recipients receiving postsecondary remedial education; requiring payment of tuition costs by school districts; authorizing loans as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Remediation for Hathaway recipients.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Matthias Greene [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] |
Rep. Samuel Krone [R] | Rep. Matt Teeters [R] | Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-25 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-25 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2013-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0209.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0209.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0209.htm |