WY HB0204 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; requiring trains to be not more than a specified length; providing operational requirements; providing a civil penalty; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Allowable train lengths.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Berger [R] | Rep. Kenneth Chestek [D] | Rep. Sandy Newsome [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-2-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-03 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-2-0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |