WY HB0204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to livestock; amending the fee for permits to feed garbage to swine; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Feeding garbage to swine-permit fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0- (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-6-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |