WY HB0198 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the University of Wyoming; clarifying the authority of the university over water; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
University water system.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 93 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2021-04-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0065 | |
2021-03-31 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-26 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-11 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |