WY HB0197 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public safety and health; requiring physicians to wait a specified period of time before performing certain nonemergency abortion procedures; modifying penalties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Abortion-48 hour waiting period.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Timothy Hallinan [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. Clarence Styvar [R] | Rep. Richard Tass [R] |
Rep. John Winter [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 43-16-1-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |