WY HB0191 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to termination of parental rights; requiring notice of the effect of termination before parental rights are terminated; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Termination of parental rights-child support obligation.
Sponsors
Rep. David Northrup [R] | Rep. Scott Court [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] |
Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 55-4-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |