WY HB0189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned Chapter Number 156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mine product taxes; clarifying the imposition of severance taxes on natural gas that is consumed on-site; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mine product taxes for natural gas consumed on-site.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Passed 36-20-3-0-1 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-0-0-1 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-1-0-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-4-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-0-0-1 (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-1-0-1 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-4-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 156 | |
2021-04-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0090 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0090 |
2021-04-06 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0090 |
2021-04-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0090 | |
2021-04-06 | House | Concur:Passed 36-20-3-0-1 |
2021-04-06 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-31 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-28-0-0-1 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-1-0-1 |
2021-03-18 | House | H03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 4-4-0-0-1 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-02 | Bill Number Assigned |