WY HB0189 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-30-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to commercial vehicles; providing an exception to signage requirements for implements of husbandry being transported less than a specified distance; requiring review of rules; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wide load restrictions-agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 26-30-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Failed 26-30-4-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-25HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-25HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback