WY HB0189 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the federal Real ID Act; amending Wyoming's motor vehicle statutes to remove provisions added in 2009 to comply with the federal Real ID Act; prohibiting the retention of documents as specified; requiring the destruction of specified documents; prohibiting late renewal penalties as specified; prohibiting nonoptical identification of driver's licenses; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of Real ID.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House - H Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26HouseCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2013-02-04HouseIntroduced and referred to H08; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08
2013-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback