WY HB0185 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; providing for allocation of funds within the permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund reserve account as specified; providing for allocation of funds within the common school permanent fund reserve account as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Distribution of investment income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |