WY HB0183 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; specifying the persons involved in horse racing activities, pari-mutuel wagering activities and other activities regulated by the Wyoming gaming commission who shall be subject to criminal background checks; specifying requirements for rules promulgated by the rulemaking authority of the Wyoming gaming commission; correcting a statutory reference; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pari-mutuel and gaming activities-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-25-0-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 37-25-0-0-0 |
2023-02-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |