WY HB0182 | 2020 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to ad valorem taxation; amending provisions for perfection of tax liens; amending notice of tax lien provisions; amending the definition of "delinquent taxpayer" for purposes of liens on mineral production; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax lien enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 50-10-0-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2020-02-26HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 50-10-0-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback