WY HB0182 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring physicians to provide patients with specified information before certain nonemergency abortion procedures; providing exceptions; providing and amending definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Abortion–ultrasound information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Chapter No. 187 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0090 | |
2017-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0090 |
2017-03-01 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0090 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0090 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Concur:Passed 47-12-1-0-0 |
2017-02-27 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-10 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |