WY HB0180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Assigned Chapter Number 157
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mixed martial arts regulation; modifying a provision relating to bonds for mixed martials arts matches; modifying duties of board representatives as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mixed martial arts regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-0-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28 Assigned Chapter Number 157
2019-02-28 Governor Signed HEA No. 0106
2019-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0106
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0106
2019-02-25 Assigned Number HEA No. 0106
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-07SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-1-0-1
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01House3rd Reading:Passed 44-13-3-0-0
2019-01-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-23HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-23HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback