WY HB0179 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to commercial motor vehicles; amending the fine for operators of commercial vehicles who fail to observe road closures; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Failure to observe closed roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - S08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in COW |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-25 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2013-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0179.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0179.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0179.htm |