WY HB0176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; specifying additional requirements for eligibility under the veterans tuition waiver program; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veterans tuition waiver program requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Did Not Consider in COW |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2017-01-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |