WY HB0176 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; exempting from sales and use taxes the sale or purchase of equipment used to generate electricity from nuclear energy; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuclear energy as carbon free renewable energy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-15 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-07 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-15 (S) Failed 3rd Reading
2011-02-14 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-11 (S) Passed CoW
2011-02-07 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-07 (S09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-03 (S) Introduced and Referred to S09
2011-02-03 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-02-03 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-02 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-01 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-28 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-28 (H09) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-20 (H) Introduced and Referred to H09
2011-01-19 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback