WY HB0175 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - President Signed HEA No. 0098
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to juveniles; requiring notification to parents, guardians or custodians when a juvenile is issued a citation as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile citations-notification by law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - S Adopted HB0175JC01 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Adopted HB0175JC01 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - H Did Not Concur (Y: 17 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - S03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0098
2013-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0098
2013-02-25 Assigned Number HEA0098
2013-02-25SenateAdopted HB0175JC01
2013-02-22HouseAdopted HB0175JC01
2013-02-20SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-20HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2013-02-20HouseDid Not Concur
2013-02-19HouseReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-19 Amendment Failed
2013-02-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-15 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-15SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-02-14SenatePassed CoW
2013-02-07SenatePlaced on General File
2013-02-07SenateRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-05SenateRereferred to S03
2013-01-29SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01
2013-01-29SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-24HousePassed CoW
2013-01-24 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-24HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2013-01-22HouseRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01
2013-01-15HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback