WY HB0174 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; imposing a one percent sales and use tax for distribution to local governments; authorizing local governments to impose a portion of the local optional sales and use tax by resolution; decreasing the maximum amount of local optional sales and use taxes; providing applicability; providing that the bill is effective contingent upon enactment of other legislation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Local government sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 10-50-0-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-03 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2021-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |