WY HB0174 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; amending the minimum school age; conforming provisions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kindergarten start date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Concur:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Assigned Chapter Number 159
2020-03-26 Became Law without Governor's Signature
2020-03-10SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0059
2020-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0059
2020-03-10 Assigned Number HEA No. 0059
2020-03-10HouseConcur:Passed 44-15-1-0-0
2020-03-09HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-09Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2020-03-06Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-05SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-04SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2020-03-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-18HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-18HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2020-02-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education 52-7-1-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback