WY HB0173 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; implementing modifications to the Wyoming education resource block grant model; codifying previously uncodified law; amending the computation of average daily membership; increasing the amount that can be computed for a school district's operating balance and cash reserves as specified; prohibiting expenditures on capital construction during a specified period; amending provisions governing the distribution of investment earnings; amending provisions governing the distribution of severance taxes; implementing a sales and use tax for school finance; providing for distribution of the taxes; amending related provisions; repealing conflicting provisions; providing applicability; providing for a study on the reorganization of school districts; requiring a report; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School finance funding-2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Concur:Failed 19-38-3-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-3-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Amendment failed 5-25-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Amendment failed 28-32-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-23 - House - Amendment failed 20-40-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07Housepostponed indefinitely
2021-04-06SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-06HouseConcur:Failed 19-38-3-0-0
2021-04-06HouseReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-5-3-0-0
2021-04-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-31SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-30SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-03-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2021-03-25SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-23House3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0
2021-03-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-19House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-18House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-17House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-12House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2021-03-11HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-08HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-08HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2021-03-02HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-01 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0173.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/HB0173.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173HW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173HW002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2006.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H2006.02.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3009.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3010.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3011.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3012.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3013.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3014.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3015.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3016.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3017.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3018.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3019.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3020.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3021.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3022.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173H3023.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173SW001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173SW002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173SW003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3006.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/HB0173S3007.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0173.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#-360
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#5232
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#5233
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#5234
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#-699
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#444
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#472
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0173#5405

Bill Comments

feedback