WY HB0172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public funds; creating the Wyoming Budget Stabilization Act; specifying limits on state expenditures; specifying distribution of surplus funds; requiring review of related statutes; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming Budget Stabilization Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseDid Not Consider in CoW
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback