WY HB0171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 173
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to food and drugs; amending substances regulated by the controlled substances act; requiring the commissioner of drugs and substances control to conform controlled substances regulation to federal law within a specified period; providing for hemp production and hemp processing; providing rulemaking authority; providing a penalty; authorizing the use and possession of hemp and hemp products; repealing conflicting provisions; requiring the department to submit a state plan for the regulation of hemp; providing appropriations; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp, cannabidiol and other controlled substance regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06 Assigned Chapter Number 173
2019-03-06 Governor Signed HEA No. 0110
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0110
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0110
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0110
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 56-3-1-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-20SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2019-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-30HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-24House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-24HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback