WY HB0163 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to severance taxes; establishing severance tax refunds for specified oil, gas and coal severance taxes based on increased federal royalty rates; authorizing the transfer of government royalty revenue as specified; providing for distribution of the state's share of specified federal mineral royalties; providing for severance tax and ad valorem distributions from federal mineral royalties as specified; requiring rulemaking; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mineral royalties-proportional severance tax refunds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 6-0-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-06 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 6-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-03 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-3-1-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |