WY HB0162 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring the office of state lands and investments to solicit proposals for the development of identified school and state trust lands in Teton county; requiring the office to review proposals and make recommendations as specified; requiring reports; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State trust lands-proposals and study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Adopted HB0162JC001: 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Adopted HB0162JC001: 47-12-1-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - Concur:Passed 2-56-2-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 34-25-1-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Assigned Chapter Number 158
2020-03-26 Became Law without Governor's Signature
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0083
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0083
2020-03-12 Assigned Number HEA No. 0083
2020-03-09SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09HouseConcur:Failed 2-56-2-0-0
2020-03-09HouseConcur:Passed 2-56-2-0-0
2020-03-06HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
2020-03-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-04SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-03SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2020-02-26SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2020-02-26SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 34-25-1-0-0
2020-02-24House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-21House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-17HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 41-19-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback