WY HB0156 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - COW:Failed 28-32-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - COW:Failed 28-32-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; amending the types of identification that can be used for the purpose of voting; repealing specified types of identification as acceptable identification; requiring address verification; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Voter identification limitations.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Allemand [R] | Rep. Tony Locke [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Sarah Penn [R] |
Rep. Daniel Singh [R] | Rep. Jeanette Ward [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - COW:Failed 28-32-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | COW:Failed 28-32-2-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |