WY HB0148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring the department of health to develop and implement statewide tobacco prevention, cessation and treatment programs and provide materials as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tobacco prevention, cessation and treatment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1- (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 3-5-1- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-13 | Bill Number Assigned |