WY HB0147 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming infrastructure authority; expanding facilities authorized under the authority to include energy transmission facilities, including coal distribution facilities and ports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Infrastructure authority-energy transmission.
Sponsors
Rep. David Miller [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] |
Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0019 | |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0019 |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0019 |
2014-02-28 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0019 | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-17 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2014-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |