WY HB0145 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fiduciaries; providing authority for a trustee to include capital gains in income as specified; authorizing certain distributions from income and principal; authorizing adjustments between income and principal; repealing provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Principal and income act amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0047 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2015-02-24 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0047 | |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |