WY HB0142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to corporations, partnerships and associations; authorizing the secretary of state to develop a blockchain or other distributed ledger filing system; providing recommendations for the filing system; providing definitions; permitting the supreme court to participate in a similar filing system; authorizing the promulgation of rules; repealing the previous enabling legislation; creating an account; providing an appropriation for developing a new filing system by the secretary of state and for advertising; providing for retention of a consultant and a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Commercial filing system update.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 |
2021-03-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-10 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-24 | Bill Number Assigned |